MD HB616 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a Maryland small or independent film entity to qualify as a film production entity under certain circumstances; altering a certain audit requirement to apply only to an entity with total direct costs that exceed $500,000; altering the amount of certain tax credit certificates that the Secretary of Commerce may issue under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-3) (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (133-3)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {905566/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback