MD HB615 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Coast Smart Council in the Department of Natural Resources; providing for the membership, chair, staffing, and duties of the Council; requiring specified structures to be constructed in accordance with specified siting and design criteria established by the Council; requiring the Council, in consultation with the Department, to develop specified criteria in accordance with specified requirements on or before June 30, 2015; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coast Smart Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-40) (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-05HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 415
2014-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2014-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-04-01SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-19SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-13SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2014-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (95-40)
2014-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {860615/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2014-02-12HouseHearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
2014-02-03HouseHearing cancelled
2014-02-12HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0615&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0615f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0615t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_415_hb0615t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0615_86061501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0615.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0615_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0615_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0615,h-0406&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0615,s-1063&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback