MD HB614 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB683
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a covered employee or a dependent of a covered employee is not entitled to compensation or benefits under the workers' compensation law to include circumstances related to the use of medical cannabis; including medical cannabis in the medicine that an employer or its insurer is required to provide to a covered employee except under certain circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Medical Cannabis – Compensation and Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled (Economic Matters) |
2022-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB683 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 9 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 9 | 660 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |