MD HB614 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Prince George's County Board of Education to require all members to be elected; providing that any elected member who no longer resides in Prince George's County may not continue to serve on the board; repealing provisions relating to the appointed members the Board; requiring members of the county board to be elected by the voters of the entire county; repealing provisions establishing the county superintendent as the Chief Executive Officer of the Prince George's County public school system; etc.
Title
Prince George’s County – Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer – Alterations PG 503–21
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
County Administrators
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Prince George's County
Reports
Residency
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Prince George's County
Reports
Residency
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 3 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 125.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 201.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0614?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0614f.pdf |