MD HB610 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering eligibility for the homeowners' property tax credit to include certain surviving family members of the homeowner who stand to inherit the dwelling of the homeowner under certain circumstances; altering the definition of "legal interest" as it applies to certain provisions; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility of Surviving Family Member

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2021-02-25HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2021-02-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {915065/1 Adopted
2021-02-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property9104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback