MD HB610 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch may not prohibit a dealer from advertising a vehicle for sale or lease at a certain price or coerce or require a dealer to change the advertising medium for a certain price; and requiring a contract for the sale of a vehicle by a dealer to contain a certain statement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Advertisements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback