MD HB607 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the purpose of the Maryland Trauma Physician Services Fund to include subsidizing the documented costs incurred by the State primary adult resource center to maintain certain on-call and standby health care providers; and requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to develop certain guidelines for the reimbursement of certain costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395
2019-03-25HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-21SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-21SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-13HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback