MD HB605 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Commission to Establish a Memorial to the Global War on Terror to study establishing a memorial dedicated to Marylanders who have fought in the Global War on Terror and their families; and requiring the Commission to submit a final report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before 1 year and 3 months after the effective date of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission to Establish a Memorial to the Global War on Terror

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16SenateReferred Education, Energy, and the Environment
2023-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2023-03-14HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2023-02-10HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-03HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB473 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback