MD HB605 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling in the State specified seeds, material, and plants that have been treated with a neonicotinoid pesticide unless the seeds, material, and plants bear a label with a specified statement; prohibiting a person from selling in the State, on or after January 1, 2016, a neonicotinoid pesticide unless the person also sells a restricted-use pesticide; prohibiting a person, except specified individuals, from using a neonicotinoid pesticide on or after January 1, 2016; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |