MD HB603 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the process for appointing members of the Harford County Board of Education.
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-6) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {333927/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
County Councils
County Executives
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Harford County
Minorities
Time
Voting
County Executives
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Harford County
Minorities
Time
Voting