MD HB602 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2024, 2025, and 2026, to include in the annual budget bill a certain appropriation for the Board of Public Works to provide an operating grant to the Board of Trustees of the Historic Sotterley, Inc., to be used for the design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and general operations and expenses of Historic Sotterley, located in Hollywood.
Title
Board of Public Works - Historic Sotterley - Operating Grant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595 |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-25) |
2022-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {493826/1 Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-28) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {553024/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB913 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-08 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Governor
Grants
Historical Matters
Operating Budget
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Sunset
Budgets
Governor
Grants
Historical Matters
Operating Budget
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Sunset