MD HB602 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1007
Note: Carry Over of previous HB756
Note: Carry Over of previous HB756
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to establish reimbursement levels, rather than maximum reimbursement levels, for drug products for which there is a certain generic equivalent; requiring that certain minimum reimbursement levels be at least equal to the National Average Drug Acquisition Cost of the generic product plus the fee-for-service professional dispensing fee determined by the Maryland Department of Health in accordance with the most recent in-State cost-of-dispensing survey; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB602 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB756 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
HB756 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Fees
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Fees
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 1632 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |