MD HB601 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard for 2019 to 2021 and later; and applying the Act retroactively to all renewable portfolio standard compliance years that begin on or after January 1, 2019.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {217572/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {343994/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Special Order until end of this calendar (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {343994/1 |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |