MD HB60 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a certain pollution fee to be charged by the Department of the Environment and collected by the Comptroller on certain new motor vehicles sold or registered in the State based on certain pollution ratings; exempting certain motor vehicles from the fee; and requiring the fee to be deposited in the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund and used for certain purposes.
Title
Environment – New Motor Vehicles – Pollution Fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2021-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB126 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture
Air Pollution
Ambulances
Buses
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Fees
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Trucks
Weights and Measures
Air Pollution
Ambulances
Buses
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Fees
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Trucks
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 2 | 1209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0060?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0060f.pdf |