MD HB599 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the definition of "public safety officer" for purposes of a certain credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on a dwelling owned by a public safety officer; repealing a certain limitation on the amount of the credit; requiring the governing body of a county or municipal corporation that authorizes the credit to establish, by law, the definition of "public safety officer" for purposes of eligibility for the credit; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-10SenateReferred Rules
2023-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2023-04-08HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2023-02-08HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-03HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB61 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property9260(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback