MD HB599 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, on or before April 1, 2022, to develop and publish materials to assist State residents with long-term care family planning; requiring certain materials to meet certain requirements, be consistent with certain other materials, and include certain contact information; requiring the Department to make certain materials available in certain languages; and requiring certain State agencies to update certain websites in a certain manner on or before April 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateReferred Finance
2021-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2021-02-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-17HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB652 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General202001(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback