MD HB599 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization to use the most recent treatment criteria developed by the American Society of Addiction Medicine for addictive, substance-related, and co-occurring conditions for all medical necessity and utilization management determinations for substance use disorder benefits; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria
Sponsors
Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {576284/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Reports
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Reports