MD HB598 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a raffle to be conducted in Prince George's County by a specified charitable foundation affiliated with a professional football team that plays its home games in the county; setting no limitation on the number of raffle permits that may be issued in a year; authorizing the charitable foundation to set the price of raffle tickets; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Raffles - Charitable Foundations PG 301-15

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99
2015-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2015-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2015-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2015-04-01SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-23SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2015-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (135-1)
2015-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {485261/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2015-03-03HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-12HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0598&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0598f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0598t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_99_hb0598t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0598_48526101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0598.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0598_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0598_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0598,h-0518&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0598,s-0899&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback