MD HB598 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a political subdivision to bill for water service on an every other month basis; and authorizing the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to bill for water and sewer usage charges on an every other month basis.
Title
Water and Sewer Service - Billing Period
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | Special Order until 3/22 (Delegate Davis) Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate W. Miller) Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Environment
Municipal Corporations
Sewage
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water
Counties
Environment
Municipal Corporations
Sewage
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water