MD HB597 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War; requiring the Commission, in consultation with certain persons, to conduct research to advance the documentation of African American patriots in the American Revolutionary War; requiring the Commission to determine and send to the county boards of education certain information; requiring the Commission to develop and print a certain publication; terminating the Act on September 30, 2023; etc.
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {426682/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education, Boards of
General Services, Department of
Historical Matters
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education, Boards of
General Services, Department of
Historical Matters
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials