MD HB596 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Entering into the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact; providing the purpose of the Compact is to strengthen access to health care by developing a process to complement existing licensing authority and provide a streamlined method for physicians to be licensed in multiple states; requiring a physician to meet certain eligibility requirements to receive an initial expedited license; establishing an Interstate Commission to administer the Compact and develop certain rules; establishing requirements for certain disciplinary actions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {336985/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseHearing canceled
2018-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback