MD HB595 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the governing body of Baltimore County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county tax imposed on real property that is owned by the Rosewald Beach Civic League; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2010; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Rosewald Beach Civic League

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-13 Approved by the Governor
2010-03-31 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2010-03-30 Second Reading Passed
2010-03-30 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-01 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2010-03-12 First Reading Budget and Taxation
2010-03-28 Returned Passed
2010-03-11 Third Reading Passed (136-0)
2010-03-09 Second Reading Passed
2010-03-09 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-03-08 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
2010-02-03 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-03 First Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback