MD HB593 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Defining the term "mortgage lender" to mean a person that is duly licensed under certain provisions of the Financial Institutions Article; clarifying the definition of the term "consumer claim"; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the Act be construed as clarifying the Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act and that, with regard to sales of real property to bona fide purchasers, the Act applies only to sales made on or after the June 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-39) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (98-39)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {483995/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback