MD HB593 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-7)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the student loan tax credit that allows certain individuals with certain student loan debt amounts to claim a credit against the State income tax to include graduate student loan debt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Student Loan Tax Credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {123929/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (11-35) (Y: 12 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {123929/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (11-35)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (134-2)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {405667/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback