MD HB59 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education to include an Equity category and certain subcategories in the Anne Arundel County Board of Education annual budget; and requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education to provide certain information on whether the allocations for equity interventions in the annual budget are being increased, maintained, or reduced from the prior annual budget for each subcategory.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education Budget - Equity Category
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2020-03-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-13 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Demographics
Discrimination
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Federal Government
Food
Grants
Health
Indigent Persons
Job Training
Language
Minorities
Poverty
Prices
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Students
Work, Labor and Employment
Budgets
Demographics
Discrimination
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Federal Government
Food
Grants
Health
Indigent Persons
Job Training
Language
Minorities
Poverty
Prices
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Students
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0059?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0059f.pdf |