MD HB586 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Queen Anne's County to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings used for agritourism from certain building performance standards; and exempting a building used for agritourism in Queen Anne's County from a certain permit requirement under certain circumstances.
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {533228/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB489 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Subjects
Agriculture
Building Codes
Building Permits
Counties - Generally
Public Safety
Queen Anne's County
Safety
Tourism
Building Codes
Building Permits
Counties - Generally
Public Safety
Queen Anne's County
Safety
Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 12 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |