MD HB586 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB479
Note: Carry Over of previous HB716
Note: Carry Over of previous HB716
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the fourth Thursday in March as Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day through appropriate and informative programs and activities.
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB586 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
SB303 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-20 - Referred Health and Government Operations
HB716 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB303 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-20 - Referred Health and Government Operations
HB716 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Communications
Education
Governor
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Communications
Education
Governor
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 7 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0586?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0586f.pdf |