MD HB580 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to make available a certain form; requiring certain biosafety level 3 (BSL-3) laboratories in Frederick County to report certain information to the Department on or before October 30 each year; requiring the Department to report the number and location of BSL-3 laboratories to the Maryland Emergency Management Agency and certain officials in Frederick County and the total number of laboratories to the Governor and General Assembly by December 31 each year; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories in Frederick County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 262 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {336785/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB450 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 263
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Damages
Death
Disclosure
Emergency Services
Forms
Frederick County
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Hospitals
Injury
Jurisdiction
Laboratories
Liability
Medical Schools
Personal Property
Privacy
Property Damage
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Safety
Damages
Death
Disclosure
Emergency Services
Forms
Frederick County
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Hospitals
Injury
Jurisdiction
Laboratories
Liability
Medical Schools
Personal Property
Privacy
Property Damage
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 17 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |