MD HB58 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Including income from an individual retirement account or a certain annuity within a certain subtraction modification for certain retirement income under certain circumstances; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {105969/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-11HouseHearing canceled
2018-01-17HouseHearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-10HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2017-11-15HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback