MD HB576 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain required information in a petition of support as part of an application for an alcoholic beverages license in Carroll County; requiring an application for a license to include a petition of support signed by at least 10 residents who meet certain qualifications; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Required Information on Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {983698/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Carroll County
Petitions
Residency
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Carroll County
Petitions
Residency