MD HB575 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene on or before October 1, 2011, to develop and implement a streamlined process for the annual redetermination of eligibility for specified Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients who require a nursing facility level of care; and requiring the Department to report on the development and implementation of the process to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2011.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Redeterminations of Eligibility for
Sponsors
Del. Donald Dwyer [R] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] | Del. Tony McConkey [R] |
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Veronica Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0575.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0575f.pdf |