MD HB569 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to 3,000 megawatts the statewide limit on rated generating capacity for net energy metering under a certain contract or tariff available to certain eligible customer-generators.
Title
Electricity - Net Energy Metering - Limit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271 |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-41) |
2021-04-01 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {487872/1 Adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-37) |
2021-02-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB407 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Subjects
Contracts
Energy
Energy Matters
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Energy
Energy Matters
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 306.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |