MD HB569 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "licensed health care practitioner" for the purposes of certain provisions of law governing vital statistics and records to include a registered nurse certified as a certified nurse midwife under Title 8 of the Health Occupations Article, a licensed clinical professional counselor licensed under Title 17 of the Health Occupations Article, or a physician assistant licensed under Title 15 of the Health Occupations Article.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-43) (Y: 95 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (94-43)
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {636485/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback