MD HB569 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with local government officials, to conduct a review of State programs that provide financial assistance for costs relating to the planning, design, construction, and upgrade of wastewater treatment facilities in the State; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Financial Assistance Study

Sponsors

Del. Donald Elliott [R]Del. Kathy Afzali [R]Del. Sam Arora [D]Del. Susan Aumann [R]
Sen. Gail Bates [R]Sen. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Wendell Beitzel [R]Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D]
Del. Joseph Boteler [R]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Emmett Burns [D]Del. Rudolph Cane [D]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. John Cluster [R]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Robert Costa [R]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. John Donoghue [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Donald Dwyer [R]
Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R]Del. William Frank [R]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Ronald George [R]
Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Glen Glass [R]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Sen. Guy Guzzone [D]
Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [?]Del. Peter Hammen [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Patrick Hogan [R]
Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Sen. Michael Hough [R]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. James Hubbard [D]
Del. Tom Hucker [D]Del. Richard Impallaria [R]Del. Jay Jacobs [R]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Kevin Kelly [D]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]
Del. Mary Love [D]Del. Susan McComas [R]Del. Tony McConkey [R]Del. Michael McDermott [R]
Del. Patrick McDonough [R]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Herbert McMillan [R]Del. Aruna Miller [D]
Del. Warren Miller [R]Del. Peter Murphy [D]Del. Leroy Myers [R]Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D]
Del. Doyle Niemann [D]Sen. Wayne Norman [R]Del. Anthony O'Donnell [R]Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D]
Del. Charles Otto [R]Del. Neil Parrott [R]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]
Del. James Proctor [D]Sen. Justin Ready [R]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Sen. Barbara Robinson [D]
Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. David Rudolph [D]Del. Kelly Schulz [R]Sen. Andrew Serafini [R]
Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]Del. Nancy Stocksdale [R]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]Del. Shawn Tarrant [D]
Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Cathleen Vitale [R]Del. Michael Weir [D]
Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. John Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-02SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-03-19SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2013-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-03-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-03-04HouseFavorable Report by Environmental Matters
2013-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-31HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback