MD HB566 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to adopt certain regulations for county boards of education to include waste disposal infrastructure in the design documents submitted to the Interagency Commission for the construction of a new school building utilizing State funding; defining "waste disposal infrastructure" as a place for the disposal of trash, recyclables, and food scraps and a sink for liquid waste; etc.
Title
School Construction – Design Documents – Waste Disposal Infrastructure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 550 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-31) |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education, Boards of
Food
Primary and Secondary Education
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Construction
Education, Boards of
Food
Primary and Secondary Education
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations