MD HB564 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a residential lease to include a requirement that a tenant hold a renter's insurance policy; prohibiting a lease from containing certain requirements regarding a renter's insurance policy; and requiring a landlord to acquire a renter's insurance policy on behalf of a tenant if the tenant does not have a policy.
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Renter's Insurance Requirement
Sponsors
Del. Deni Taveras [D] | Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Ashanti Martinez [D] | Del. Gary Simmons [D] |
Del. Joe Vogel [D] | Del. Jamila Woods [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m. |
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB725 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0564?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0564f.pdf |