MD HB564 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified units of State government from limiting, to less than 60 days, the aggregate number of days of accrued sick leave that specified employees may use, without certification of illness or disability, for the birth or adoption of their child; prohibiting specified units of State government from limiting to less than 24 weeks, the aggregate number of weeks of family and medical leave that specified employees may use during a specified time period for a specified purpose; etc.
Title
State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-2) (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-4) (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-4) (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-2) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-4) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {607774/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Adoption
Budget and Management, Department of
Child Care
Disabilities
Foster Care
Health
Leave
Marriage
Minors
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Adoption
Budget and Management, Department of
Child Care
Disabilities
Foster Care
Health
Leave
Marriage
Minors
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Government - Personnel