MD HB562 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB712
Note: Carry Over of previous HB799
Note: Carry Over of previous HB799
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a farm equipment manufacturer to make available certain documentation, updates, or information to an independent repair provider or owner of farm equipment to allow for the diagnosis, maintenance, or repair of the farm equipment; prohibiting a farm equipment manufacturer from knowingly misrepresenting or withholding farm equipment part numbers from a customer for a certain purpose; applying the Act prospectively: etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair - Farm Equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB562 (Carry Over) 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
HB799 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
HB799 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Subjects
Agriculture
Business Regulation
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Equipment
Farmland
Independent Contractors
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Trade Secrets
Unfair Trade Practices
Business Regulation
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Equipment
Farmland
Independent Contractors
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Trade Secrets
Unfair Trade Practices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |