MD HB562 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing Montgomery County and municipalities of Montgomery County to decrease the maximum speed limit to not less than 15 miles per hour on highways only after performing an engineering and traffic investigation; and prohibiting Montgomery County and municipalities in Montgomery County from implementing a new speed monitoring system to enforce speed limits on certain highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Montgomery County – Speed Limits – Establishment MC 02–21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
2021-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (102-35)
2021-04-09HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {608979/1 Adopted
2021-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-09SenateHearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
2021-03-09SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (104-27)
2021-03-04HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-01HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-01-29HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21803(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback