MD HB561 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1036
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Judiciary, in consultation with domestic violence and child abuse organizations, to develop a training program for judges and magistrates presiding over child custody cases involving child abuse or domestic violence; requiring the training program to include certain information; and requiring the Maryland Judiciary to adopt procedures to ensure that only judges who have received certain training are assigned child custody cases that may involve child abuse or domestic violence.
Title
Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2022-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {673523/1 Adopted |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB17 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
HB1036 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
HB1036 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Custody
Continuing Education
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Health
Job Training
Judges
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Social Services
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Custody
Continuing Education
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Health
Job Training
Judges
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Social Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 9 | 101.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |