MD HB561 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Applying certain laws regarding net energy metering and community solar generating systems to customers served by a community choice aggregator; altering the circumstances under which counties and municipal corporations may act as an aggregator; establishing a certain Community Choice Aggregator Pilot Program; establishing a process by which, beginning on October 1, 2022, a certain county may form a community choice aggregator; requiring a certain county to develop a plan and give notice of a certain aggregation plan; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (93-37)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseMotion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {633193/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-01-29HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB315 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7306(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7306.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7507(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7510.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback