MD HB561 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Applying certain laws regarding net energy metering and community solar generating systems to customers served by a community choice aggregator; repealing a provision that prohibits a county or municipal corporation from acting as an aggregator under certain circumstances; establishing a process by which, beginning on October 1, 2021, a county or municipal corporation or group of counties or municipal corporations may form or join a community choice aggregator; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB315 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7306(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7306.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7507(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7510(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7510.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback