MD HB559 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB193
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court to stay the entering of judgment, defer further proceedings, and place a certain defendant on probation subject to reasonable conditions if the court finds facts justifying a finding of guilt; authorizing the court and a certain defendant to enter into a probation agreement under certain circumstances; providing that the entry of a probation agreement under the Act shall be considered as a probation before judgment for all other purposes under State law; etc.
Title
Probation Before Judgment - Probation Agreements - Probation Not Deportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 373528/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 86 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 373528/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 86 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {163028/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-41) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment {373528/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (40-86) |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313221/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB559 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted
SB265 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
SB265 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Subjects
Appeals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
defendants
Judgments
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pleas
Trials
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
defendants
Judgments
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pleas
Trials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |