MD HB558 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the number of members of the Baltimore City School Commissioners; requiring the two elected board members to be elected at large by the voters of Baltimore City; providing for the terms of the appointed and elected members of the Board; requiring the elected members of the Board to be elected at the general election in November 2022 and every 4 years thereafter in accordance with specified provisions of law; providing for the removal of the elected members of the Board; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Partially Elected School Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-28HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
2016-04-11HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2016-04-11HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2016-04-11SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Conway) {643220/2 Adopted
2016-04-11SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
2016-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-09SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {723221/1 Adopted
2016-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-09SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
2016-04-09SenateFavorable
2016-04-07SenateSpecial Order until 4/9 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2016-04-07SenateFavorable
2016-04-07SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-1)
2016-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {785469/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2016-02-18HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-03HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0558&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0558f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0558t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0558e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_723_hb0558e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0558_78546901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0558_72322101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0558_64322002.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0558.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0558_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0558_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0558,h-0542&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0558,s-1295&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0558,h-1418&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback