MD HB557 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB411

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain local governments to allow, by law, a first-time homebuyer in the State to calculate the homestead property tax credit for property that includes a newly purchased dwelling using a certain method; requiring that the credit for a newly purchased dwelling be calculated in a certain manner; providing that a certain homeowner may receive the larger of the homestead property tax credit amounts as calculated using certain methods; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

HB411 (Carry Over) 2020-01-23 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property9105(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback