MD HB555 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition on the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County from issuing a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license for use by a drugstore in Baltimore County.
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsors
Del. Bob Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {173092/1 Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Retail Sales
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |