MD HB554 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain assisted living programs to report certain information, on or before June 1 each year, to the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General; requiring the Office of Health Care Quality within the Maryland Department of Health to refer an allegation of an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice by an assisted living program to the Division of Consumer Protection and the Office of the Inspector General within the Department; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateReferred Finance
2021-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2021-02-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {986783/1 Adopted
2021-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB507 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-26 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Commercial Law134B-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General191801(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General191814(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback