MD HB552 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a Class 7 micro-brewery licensee in Wicomico County to sell beer at retail to customers for consumption off the licensed premises in refillable containers that are sealed by the licensee at the time of each refill.
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-02 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0552.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0552f.pdf |