MD HB548 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board to adopt regulations authorizing and establishing the process for collective bargaining for student athletes on or before July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective Bargaining - Student Athletes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2019-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-14HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback