MD HB547 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Head Start Program in the State to be referred to as the Ulysses Currie Head Start Program; and requiring the Governor to include an appropriation of at least $3,000,000 for the Ulysses Currie Head Start Program in each annual budget submission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education – Head Start Program – Annual Appropriation (The Ulysses Currie Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-8) (Y: 129 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555
2018-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-04-09SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2018-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (128-8)
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03HouseFloor Amendment {103722/1 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
2018-04-03HouseMotion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
2018-04-03HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Jones) Adopted
2018-03-30HouseSpecial Order until 4/2 (Delegate Jones) Adopted
2018-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments {434369/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0547&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0547f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0547t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_555_hb0547t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0547_43436901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0547_10372201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0547.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0547_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1056.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0547_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1408.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback